WA HB2141 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting affordable housing in unincorporated areas within urban growth areas of large counties.
Title
Promoting affordable housing in unincorporated areas within urban growth areas of large counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Donaghy [D] | Rep. Sam Low [R] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
84 | 14 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 14 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |