WA HB2138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax relief for the construction of adapted housing for disabled veterans.
Title
Concerning tax relief for the construction of adapted housing for disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-04 | House | Chapter 176, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-30 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |