WA HB2136 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to comprehensive marijuana market reforms to ensure a well-regulated and taxed marijuana market in Washington state.
Title
Relating to comprehensive marijuana market reforms to ensure a well-regulated and taxed marijuana market in Washington state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Effective date 7/1/2015*. |
2015-06-30 | House | Chapter 4, 2015 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2015-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-26 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-06-26 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2015-06-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-04-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-04-10 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-06 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-03-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 2:00 PM. |
2015-03-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 6:00 PM. |
2015-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |