WA HB2131 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a credit under the public utility tax for sales and use taxes paid for the development of eligible renewable resources in the state that provide renewable energy to a qualifying utility.
Title
Providing a credit under the public utility tax for sales and use taxes paid for the development of eligible renewable resources in the state that provide renewable energy to a qualifying utility.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Finance. | |
2009-02-18 | TEC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology, and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. |