WA HB2118 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additive transportation funding and appropriations.
Title
Concerning additive transportation funding and appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5975 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2022.