WA HB2114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting consumers from charges for out-of-network health services.
Title
Protecting consumers from charges for out-of-network health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-17 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |