WA HB2110 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganizing statutory requirements governing high school graduation.
Title
Reorganizing statutory requirements governing high school graduation.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Nance [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 66, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-25 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 150 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 230 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 230 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 230 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 230 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 230 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 300 | 750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 300 | 900 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 305 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 320 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 655 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 655 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |