WA HB2105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting transparency in government by requiring public agencies with governing bodies to post their agendas online in advance of meetings.
Title
Promoting transparency in government by requiring public agencies with governing bodies to post their agendas online in advance of meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | House | Chapter 61, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |