WA HB2082 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Assessing child care access.
Title
Assessing child care access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |