WA HB2080 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to House Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to House Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a liquor license endorsement.
Title
Creating a liquor license endorsement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Returned to House Rules. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5940 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.