WA HB2078 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the outdoor school for all program.
Title
Establishing the outdoor school for all program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Chapter 112, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5925 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 300 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 300 | 790 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 320 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |