WA HB2075 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing service requirements for the department of social and health services.
Title
Establishing service requirements for the department of social and health services.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Frank Chopp [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-15 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-03 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |