WA HB2075 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing the authority of the department of agriculture to conduct livestock brand inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing the authority of the department of agriculture to conduct livestock brand inspections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2019-03-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB5967 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-22 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback