WA HB2074 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fees collected from out-of-state residents who register off-road vehicles in Washington.
Title
Concerning fees collected from out-of-state residents who register off-road vehicles in Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 40, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:00 PM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 09 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 09 | 442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |