WA HB2072 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the child rescue fund.
Title
Concerning the child rescue fund.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2072&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2072.pdf |