WA HB2069 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a property owner's or tenant's liability for delinquent and unpaid utility service charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning a property owner's or tenant's liability for delinquent and unpaid utility service charges.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-07HouseCRJ - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2020-01-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-15HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback