WA HB2067 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the disclosure of certain individual vehicle and vessel owner information of those participating in the address confidentiality program.
Title
Prohibiting the disclosure of certain individual vehicle and vessel owner information of those participating in the address confidentiality program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 278, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at time TBA. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |