WA HB2066 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of wax and ceramic materials used to make molds.
Title
Concerning the taxation of wax and ceramic materials used to make molds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5702 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2066&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2066.pdf |