WA HB2059 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning real estate agency law, but only to clarify that the statutory duties of real estate brokers apply to all parties and prohibiting the delivery of buyer unfair practice letters to the seller of residential real estate.
Title
Concerning real estate agency law, but only to clarify that the statutory duties of real estate brokers apply to all parties and prohibiting the delivery of buyer unfair practice letters to the seller of residential real estate.
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Greg Gilday [R] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-31 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 86 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 86 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |