WA HB2058 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the preservation and protection of facilities owned by the state parks and recreation commission that are listed on the Washington heritage register or the national register of historic places.
Title
Concerning the preservation and protection of facilities owned by the state parks and recreation commission that are listed on the Washington heritage register or the national register of historic places.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 1/1/2023. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 147, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |