WA HB2052 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying marijuana product testing by revising provisions concerning marijuana testing laboratory accreditation and establishing a cannabis science task force.
Title
Clarifying marijuana product testing by revising provisions concerning marijuana testing laboratory accreditation and establishing a cannabis science task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019*. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 277, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |