WA HB2050 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creating Washington wine special license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Washington wine special license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-03-09SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-19Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-19SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-20SenateReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-15SenateTR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-15SenateExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Transportation.
2020-01-13SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-03-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-13House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM.
2019-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2050&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2050.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2050-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2050-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2050-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2050-S2.E.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119551&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2050&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119551&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-19-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2050&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback