WA HB2049 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning commercial egg layer operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning commercial egg layer operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-07HouseChapter 276, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-22HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-03-29SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-29SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-29SenateCommittee amendment
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-21SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2019-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22HouseRDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2049&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2049.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2049-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2049-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2049-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119550&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2049&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119550&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-29-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2049&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119550&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2049&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback