WA HB2048 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning temporary assistance for needy families time limit extensions.
Title
Concerning temporary assistance for needy families time limit extensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |