WA HB2041 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the deduction for handling losses of motor vehicle fuel.
Title
Repealing the deduction for handling losses of motor vehicle fuel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | TR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-22 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-22 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM. |
2013-04-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2013-04-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |