WA HB2040 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nonhigh school districts.
Title
Concerning nonhigh school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | House | Chapter 225, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |