WA HB2040 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the notice of termination for tenancies under the residential landlord-tenant act.
Title
Increasing the notice of termination for tenancies under the residential landlord-tenant act.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5408 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2040&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2040.pdf |