WA HB2038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the applicability of RCW 70.345.080 to only vapor products.
Title
Clarifying the applicability of RCW 70.345.080 to only vapor products.
Sponsors
Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | House | Chapter 210, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |