WA HB2035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning taxes on in-state broadcasters.
Title
Concerning taxes on in-state broadcasters.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019**. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 449, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |