WA HB2034 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile records.
Title
Concerning juvenile records.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Rob Chase [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 6:00 PM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 50 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 50 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |