WA HB2033 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning safety measures for fire department vehicles and other vehicles using lights or other signals in emergency or work zones.
Title
Concerning safety measures for fire department vehicles and other vehicles using lights or other signals in emergency or work zones.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Donaghy [D] | Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 279, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 37 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |