WA HB2029 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating economic development-related agencies, boards, and commissions.
Title
Eliminating economic development-related agencies, boards, and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014**. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 112, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | House | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-21 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-21 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-23 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-23 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-04-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2013-04-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |