WA HB2028 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning manufacturer and new dealer franchise agreements.
Title
Concerning manufacturer and new dealer franchise agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Sen. Mike Chapman [D] | Sen. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Bryan Sandlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-31 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5945 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 70 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 70 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 96 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 96 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 96 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 96 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 96 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |