WA HB2024 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a sales and use tax deferral for projects to improve the state route number 520 corridor.
Title
Concerning a sales and use tax deferral for projects to improve the state route number 520 corridor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 144, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-03-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-03-05 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-17 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2022-02-01 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5899 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-19 - First reading, referred to Transportation.