WA HB2016 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning unmanned aerial vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning unmanned aerial vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-02-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2015-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback