WA HB2014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Collecting data on hunger in Washington state.
Title
Collecting data on hunger in Washington state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5485 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.