WA HB2007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making provisions to commemorate the centennial of national women's suffrage.
Title
Making provisions to commemorate the centennial of national women's suffrage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |