WA HB2001 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the ability to build tiny houses.
Title
Expanding the ability to build tiny houses.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Rob Chase [R] |
Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 275, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |