WA HB1996 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a San Juan Islands stewardship special license plate. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Creating a San Juan Islands special license plate. )
Title
Creating a San Juan Islands stewardship special license plate. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Creating a San Juan Islands special license plate. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 10/1/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 177, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5919 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.