WA HB1995 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Capital Budget.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Capital Budget.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rehabilitation of historic buildings.
Title
Concerning the rehabilitation of historic buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2017-02-15 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |