WA HB1994 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating transportation projects of statewide significance.
Title
Facilitating transportation projects of statewide significance.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 137, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5847 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.