WA HB1974 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Moving state board of education and educational service district elections to the Washington state school directors' association.
Title
Moving state board of education and educational service district elections to the Washington state school directors' association.
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Chapter 79, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 305 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 310 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 310 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 310 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 310 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 310 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 310 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 345 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |