WA HB1973 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recording of school board meetings.
Title
Concerning the recording of school board meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Rep. Greg Gilday [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 320 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 30 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 56 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |