WA HB1967 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
Pending: Senate Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
Pending: Senate Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning noncompetition agreements.
Title
Concerning noncompetition agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |