WA HB1966 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Business & Financial Services.
Pending: Senate Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Business & Financial Services.
Pending: Senate Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the minimum operating requirements and the review of plans necessary to be included in the small business retirement marketplace.
Title
Addressing the minimum operating requirements and the review of plans necessary to be included in the small business retirement marketplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Business & Financial Services. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5675 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Effective date 7/23/2017.