WA HB1966 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 8/1/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 8/1/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding wheelchair users to the types of individuals for whom drivers must take additional precautions.
Title
Adding wheelchair users to the types of individuals for whom drivers must take additional precautions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective date 8/1/2010. | |
2010-03-24 | Chapter 184, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |