WA HB1965 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing whistleblowers to bring actions on behalf of the state for violations of workplace protections.
Title
Allowing whistleblowers to bring actions on behalf of the state for violations of workplace protections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |