WA HB1964 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Effective date 7/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing prorate and fuel tax collections by improving taxpayer compliance, providing additional enforcement mechanisms, and protecting confidential taxpayer information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing prorate and fuel tax collections by improving taxpayer compliance, providing additional enforcement mechanisms, and protecting confidential taxpayer information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21HouseEffective date 7/1/2024.
2024-02-21HouseChapter 1, 2024 Laws.
2024-02-21HouseGovernor signed.
2024-02-16HouseDelivered to Governor.
2024-02-16SenatePresident signed.
2024-02-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-02-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2024-02-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2024-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2024-02-05SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2024-02-05SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2024-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-31SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2024-01-29HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2024-01-29HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-01-29HouseFloor amendment
2024-01-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2024-01-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-01-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2024-01-17HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2024-01-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2023-12-18HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5847 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4687020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4687080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4687350Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238New CodeSee Bill Text
8238020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238170Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238260Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8238380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8242New CodeSee Bill Text
8242010Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8242118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8242210Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1964&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1964.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1964.E.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1964.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1964.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1964%20AMH%20GOEH%20H2859.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1964%20AMH%20RAMO%20HAJE%20402.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68826
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68989
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1964%20HBA%20TR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1964%20HBR%20TR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69920
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1964.E%20HBR%20APH%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70429
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70432
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1964.E%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70478
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1964.E%20HBR%20PL%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1964.E%20SBR%20APS%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70550
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1964.E%20HBR%20FBR%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130038&actionText=TR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31617&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=130038&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-29-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1964&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130038&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31880&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=130038&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-06-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1964&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback