WA HB1959 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning managed health care system rate review.
Title
Concerning managed health care system rate review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |