WA HB1959 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public hearing before a local government may remove a restrictive covenant from land owned by the local government.
Title
Requiring a public hearing before a local government may remove a restrictive covenant from land owned by the local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-25 | House | Chapter 119, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |